SHEFFORD SAINTS FOOTBALL CLUB (JUNIORS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing football for both boys and girls of Shefford and the surrounding local towns and villages between 6 to 18 years of age. To advance the education of children, young people and people with disabilities, whether or not undergoing formal education. Associated activities for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN GEORGE COLES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tabitha Hyde | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Gay Needham | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Martin Purves | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lasse Hammer | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sean Patrick Moore | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Starling | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Stewart John Knight | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Roberts | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Coles | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.71k | £59.02k | £75.27k | £95.85k | £111.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.69k | £37.82k | £92.21k | £104.67k | £126.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £800 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED AUGUST 1989, 1995, 1998. MAY 2004, 2005, 2007, 11 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CLUB ARE; TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL ( FACILITIES MEANING LAND, BUILDING, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES ) FOR BOYS AND GIRLS OF SHEFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING LOCAL TOWNS AND VILLAGES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SHEFFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Palmer Close
SHEFFORD
Bedfordshire
SG17 5EE
- Phone:
- 07964124990
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window