BCA INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCA aims through independent advocacy, to empower people with a learning disability to live their lives as valued, responsible and enriched citizens We provide a range of advocacy services through one to one work with paid advocates and volunteers, and self advocacy through groups and outreach work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 12 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Weale | Chair | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Margaret Hopkins | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Stephens | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Margaret Tongue | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Richard Jones | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY SYKES | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID WALKER | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.22k | £139.71k | £119.33k | £108.27k | £64.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.26k | £114.75k | £116.87k | £130.23k | £126.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.14k | £29.14k | £14.57k | £8.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS OR DISABILITY WHETHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL, PRIMARILY ON POWYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHETHER LIVING IN RESIDENTIAL CARE OR RESIDING INDEPENDENTLY IN THEIR OWN HOMES OR WITH RELATIVES; 1 BY ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND EXERCISE FULL FREEDOM OF CHOICE; 2 BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ADVOCACY SERVICES AND SUPPORT; 3 BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 LION YARD
BRECON
LD3 7BA
- Phone:
- 07974652257
- Email:
- bca@keme.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window