THE WISH TREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to help families/individuals living in Flamstead, who are facing serious illness, operation or bereavement, to continue to function as normally as possible. The Wish Tree does this by providing funding towards competent childcare, domestic help and/or transport for a period of up to 1 year for families with dependents and for up to 3 months for those without dependents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Wendy Maria Freer | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Evans | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Sarah Anita Morris | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Clare Hickey-Colman | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MOSS | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.19k | £6.89k | £2.96k | £5.77k | £4.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.79k | £6.24k | £5.86k | £7.61k | £10.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SERIOUSLY ILL INDIVIDUALS WITHIN FAMILIES IN THE COMMUNITY OF FLAMSTEAD, AND TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES IN THE EVENTUALITY OF DEATH, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR SERVICES TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE CHILDCARE, DOMESTIC AND TRANSPORT SERVICES. NB: DEFINITIONS OF ABOVE WORDING SERIOUSLY ILL - SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL, CRITICAL OR CHRONIC ILLNESS FAMILIES - HAVING DEPENDENT CHILDREN LIVING WITH THEM (IE CHILDREN LESS THAN 18 YEARS) COMMUNITY OF FLAMSTEAD - PERSON/FAMILY INCLUDED ON THE ELECTORAL REGISTER FOR FLAMSTEAD (HERTS, UK)
Area of benefit
FLAMSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Delmerend Farm
Delmer End Lane
Flamstead
St. Albans
AL3 8ER
- Phone:
- 07799607320
- Website:
-
thewishtreecharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window