HARVEST LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING WORSHIP SERVICES TEACHING THE WORD OF GOD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 05 November 2008: Standard registration
- HARVEST OF PRAISE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- HARVEST OF PRAISE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR MARK BOATENG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL AIDOO | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
YERIMA ADAMOU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH (THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE) (THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINE) B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADULT LITERACY CLASSES. C) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 WYCLIFFE GROVE
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 5DE
- Phone:
- 07824368571
- Email:
- markboateng06@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window