ABI - UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carrying out activities in the Bakossi region of Cameroon. Working with orphanages, schools and hospitals in this local community. The organisation also spent a lot time this financial year carrying out research in the Bakossi region and looking at what can be done in the area, with the use of a few volunteers and working with other Bakossi cultural groups within the U.K and in the Diaspora.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cameroon
Governance
- 10 August 2009: Standard registration
- 09 January 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 February 2017: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IRENE NTUBE ALOBWEDE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Goddy Enongene | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £240 | £400 | £1.00k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £230 | £400 | £1.00k | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2022 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 May 2022 | 703 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN BAKOSSI, CAMEROON. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PERSONS RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORALLY IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN BAKOSSI, CAMEROON. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF RURAL BAKOSSI, CAMEROON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PERSONS LIVING IN RURAL BAKOSSI CAMEROON AND THE UK BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PAYING FOR SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
CAMEROON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Croxden Gardens
BEDFORD
MK40 4TS
- Phone:
- 01234348624
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window