ROMANCE ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within the overall objective of promoting sexual health and responsibility, to provide appropriate training programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 14 April 2008: Standard registration
- 28 December 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 December 2012: Funds transferred to 1081754 YOUTHSCAPE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.92k | £51.29k | £118.25k | £87.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.00k | £60.17k | £120.94k | £95.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 15 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 21 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 08 February 2010 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 09 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND FOSTER EDUCATION, CITIZENSHIP AND LEARNING AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF SEXUAL HEALTH AND SEXUAL RESPONSIBILITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window