Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE REGIS SCHOOL OF MUSIC

Charity number: 1123595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.45k £2.94k £6.31k £3.56k £4.32k
Total expenditure £6.40k £3.77k £4.20k £4.36k £6.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A