SEATON DELAVAL AND HOLYWELL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain,manage and promote Seaton Delaval and Holywell Community Centre in furtherance of the Associations objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 April 2008: Standard registration
- 31 August 2018: Funds received from 522130 SEATON DELAVAL AND HOLYWELL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN HOGARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA FRASER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HILLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.24k | £18.62k | £33.70k | £17.21k | £18.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.49k | £14.59k | £15.38k | £23.58k | £25.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £2.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) 18 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SEATON DELAVAL AND HOLYWELL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEATON DELAVAL AND HOLYWELL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Mindrum Way
Seaton Delaval
Whitley Bay
NE25 0HZ
- Phone:
- 01912372249
- Email:
- pete.hillman@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
sdhca.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window