SAI SRUTI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE POOR ESPECIALLY CHILDREN IN INDIA, BASED ON THE TEACHINGS OF SRI SATHYA SAI BABA, BY PROVIDING SCHOOL FEES, UNIFORMS, BOOKS ETC AND HELPING THE THE POOR BY PROVIDING FOOD, HEALTHCARE, CLEAN WATER, EYECARE, DENTAL CARE & SKILLS TRANING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 21 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayshree Patel | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LALIT GOVINDJI SHAH | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDHANBHAI MANIBHAI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANJAY GORDHANBHAI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANSUKH VANDRAVAN MADHVANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.35k | £116.41k | £111.78k | £111.78k | £94.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.33k | £48.64k | £75.57k | £110.82k | £74.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE POOR, ESPECIALLY CHILDREN IN INDIA, AFRICAN COUNTRIES AND UK BASED ON THE TEACHINGS BY THE GURU KNOWN AS SRI SATHYA SAI BABA WITH PROVISION OF SCHOOL FEES, UNIFORM, BOOKS AND STUDY MATERIALS. 2) THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY, SICK, INFIRM OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM POVERTY BY CHARITABLE MEANS AS PROVISION OF MEDICINE, CLEAN WATER, EYE CARE AND DENTAL CARE. 3) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF INDIA AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES SUFFERING FROM POVERTY THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF JOB SEEKING SKILLS SUCH AS TAILORING, DRIVING, COMPUTING.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 THE CROSS WAY
HARROW
HA3 7EJ
- Phone:
- 02088631407
- Email:
- saisruti@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window