THE GOOD HOPE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATION OF A MONTESSORI PRE-PRIMARY SCHOOL FOR THE LOCAL UNDERPRIVILIDGED COMMUNITY AT NUWEDORP NEAR MALGAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Africa
Governance
- 21 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAOMI JANE MASON BA(HONS) | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN LEE MORSE PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY SHAYNE BROWNFIELD POPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY MALCOLM MASON BSC.(CIV)ENG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442 | £1.00k | £605 | £0 | £17.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £376 | £367 | £403 | £291 | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE ENVIRONS OF THE BREEDE RIVER IN THE OVERBERG DISTRICT OF THE SOUTHERN CAPE IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 2. THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS; 4. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; AND 5. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 71
Exeter House
Putney Heath
London
SW15 3TQ
- Phone:
- 02087889579
- Email:
- masonfamily@telkomsa.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window