THE FORDHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian Faith; teaching the Scriptures in Fordham and the Colchester area:recruitment education training and sending of gospel ministers there, in the UK and abroad to establish and renew Christian Churches and ministries: the support of Christians who are persecuted: or who are engaged full-time in missionary work: and the relief of need hardship and distress without limitation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 09 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN MAIN | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Stewart | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brett | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Allan Brisk | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL DURLACHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev MICHAEL ROBERT JOHN NEVILLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.38k | £29.50k | £28.50k | £30.04k | £30.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.26k | £30.27k | £31.27k | £10.28k | £20.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM BY THE FAITHFUL TEACHING OF THE SCRIPTURES IN HE VILLAGE OF FORDHAM AND THE COLCHESTER AREA AND BY THE RECRUITMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SENDING OF GOSPEL MINISTERS AND OTHERS IN THE SAME AREA AND AROUND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD TO ESTABLISH AND RENEW CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND MINISTRIES RELATED THERETO: AND INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE PERSECUTED BY REASON OF FAITH PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL IN NATURE AND INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE ENGAGED FULL-TIME IN THE MISSIONARY WORK OF PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND IN BRINING OTHERS TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIS TEACHING. 2 THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS AMONG ANY PERSONS WITHOUT LIMITATION INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP
Area of benefit
FORDHAM AND THE COLCHESTER AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
51C Madingley Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0EL
- Phone:
- 02034818180
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window