YAMBI AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of education within the UK in the African arts, culture and heritage. 2. Training and Development of the BME individuals and community groups in the UK and in Africa, 3. Health improvement for the BME communities in the UK and DR Congo. 4. The relief of poverty and financial hardship among the BME communities in the UK and in DR Congo
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Belgium
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
- 19 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £490 | £1.74k | £941 | £580 | £510 | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | £1.68k | £891 | £560 | £496 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 31 January 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AFRICA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS OR RACE. B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE, ARTS AND CULTURE OF AFRICA. 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF ORPHANS AND WIDOWS. 3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS PRESENT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 4 THE PROMOTION OF ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window