Governance FLOWER LANE ACTION GROUP
Charity number: 1124083

Charity reporting is overdue by 1747 days
Registration history:
- 15 May 2008: Standard registration
- 09 March 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 March 2016: Re-registered
- 09 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 May 2020: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.