THE HIV RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports research into HIV infection in resource limited countries. It provides finance for individual researchers to undertake research, or research training. The support is in the form of scholarships that are awarded by a competitive, peer-reviewed, process for defined programmes of work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Georgia
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Henry Charles Mwandumba | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Rodney | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deenan Pillay | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Frances Cowan | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH BUKUSI | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Hankins | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.34k | £128.52k | £26.90k | £30.33k | £134.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.89k | £41.57k | £107.58k | £49.47k | £162.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 20 May 2020 as amended on 23 Jun 2021 as amended on 08 Dec 2022 as amended on 08 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF HIV INFECTION AND TO PROVIDE FUNDING IN CONNECTION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
437 & 439 Caledonian Road
London
N7 9BG
- Phone:
- 02078121688
- Email:
- hivresearchtrust@tht.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window