Trustees THE HIV RESEARCH TRUST
Charity number: 1123611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Elizabeth Lucy Corbett | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Henry Charles Mwandumba | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Rodney | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deenan Pillay | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Frances Cowan | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH BUKUSI | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Hankins | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.