THE FEDORA GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PERFORMANCE OF CULTURALLY DIVERSE ARTS ACTIVITIES IN SCHOOLS AND PUBLIC FESTIVALS. PERFORMANCE AND EDUCATION ACTIVITIES DEMONSTRATING AND INTERPRETING BRITISH FOLK PUPPETRY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 June 2008: Standard registration
- 08 May 2017: Funds received from 1122089 PUPPETLINK LTD
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA LOUISE HUMPHREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN ELIZABETH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLINTON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LA TOYA MCALLISTER-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.58k | £19.05k | £29.16k | £22.65k | £8.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.73k | £19.35k | £30.09k | £16.95k | £9.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 May 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PUPPETRY THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY CULTIVATION OF A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Connell Drive
Woodingdean
BRIGHTON
BN2 6RT
- Phone:
- 01273308174
- Email:
- office@thefedoragroup.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window