CORNWALL DOWNS SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To create and develop the conditions which will enable people with Down's syndrome to attain their full potential and to undertake any other charitable activities in connection with Down's syndrome in the Cornwall area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kimberley Milnes-Barker | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Harris | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Pearne | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dan Burbridge | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bonnie Davies | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Truelove | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.37k | £25.78k | £21.72k | £22.43k | £31.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.64k | £23.13k | £25.31k | £32.79k | £27.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 8 2007 as amended on 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO CREATE AND DEVELOP THE CONDITIONS WHICH WILL ENABLE PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN CONNECTION WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME IN THE CORNWALL AREA. TO OFFER SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES, HELPERS AND CARERS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 16).
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union House 111 NEW UNION STREET
COVENTRY
CV1 2NT
- Phone:
- 07704057006
- Email:
- co-ord@cdssg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window