BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN INTERFAITH FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The interfaith forum carried out a youth project that has got underway with the first of three 2 day session having been completed in Nov 2009. 45 students from 3 different secondary schools took part.The students that took part were from different faith/no faith and cultural backgrounds and different parts of the borough.A video diary of the work done by the students has been made.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOGINDER SINGH BHAMRA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Parry Foster | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hafiz Abdul Alim | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK ESTILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIS RENEE RACHEL BLACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHOK CHUDASAMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADHUBALA PANDYA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £0 | £890 | £1.41k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.69k | £0 | £1.19k | £813 | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2025 | 722 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2025 | 1087 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE; I) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHINGS, TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE DIFFERENT FAITH COMMUNITIES IN THE BOROUGH OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN; INCLUDING AN AWARENESS BOTH OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS. II) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN C V S
BOULEVARD CENTRE CATHERDRAL QUARTER
45 RAILWAY ROAD
BLACKBURN
LANCS
BB1 1EZ
- Phone:
- 01254503048
- Email:
- info@interfaithforum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window