GAURA INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty by providing financial aid and resources to individuals, charities and NGO's. We supply and support the provision of housing, education, food and healthcare projects designed to enable individuals and families to generate a sustainable income & become self-sufficient.The charity fulfills its aims by taking inspiration & insight from Vedic teachings & wisdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 24 November 2008: Standard registration
- 10 December 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.77k | £24.65k | £5.65k | £3.89k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216 | £27.15k | £3.08k | £7.10k | £299 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 May 2024 | 830 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 April 2024 | 1175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE VEDIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: VEDAS, MAMANGSHA'S, UPANISHODS, SRIMAD BHAGVAD GITA, SRIMAD BHOGOVATAM AND SANDORBHO'S. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING VEDIC MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. TO ADVANCE THE VEDIC RELIGION IN THE WHOLE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON VEDIC CULTURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE VEDIC RELIGION. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PARTS OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window