SOFII FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Online showcase of fundraising, innovation and inspiration for charitable organisations all over the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Little | Chair | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Delaney | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victor van der Veen | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joao Paulo de Andrade Vergueiro | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bharati Ramachandran | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Shah | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Watt | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Rachael Moore | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angelique Masse Nguyen | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.42k | £61.96k | £64.69k | £87.75k | £44.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.89k | £65.00k | £54.01k | £65.54k | £51.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFICACY OF CHARITIES WORLD-WIDE, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION)THROUGH ADVISING PEOPLE ABOUT SUCCESSFUL CHARITABLE FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 CHELSEA PARK GARDENS
LONDON
SW3 6AF
- Phone:
- 07903960998
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window