OLIVE TREE MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian humanitarian charity. We help all needy people, regardless of age, colour, religion or ability. We have a declaration of trust formal document prepared by our solicitors Lawson, Lewis & Co which is available on request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH RICHARD GORST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.24k | £29.85k | £31.64k | £23.34k | £21.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.96k | £21.91k | £11.20k | £26.98k | £34.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.57k | £4.76k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2022 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2022 | 730 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF CHRISTIAN BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN MORECAMBE LANCASHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK FO THE TRUST. B IRRESPECTIVE OF A RECIPIENT'S BELIEF TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNTIED KINGDOM AND EASTERN EUROPE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MORECAMBE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Mallard Close
Heysham
Morecambe
LA3 2SW
- Phone:
- 01524858950
- Email:
- otmuk@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window