SPIRITUAL HEALING ASSOCIATION WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Spiritual Healing for both Humans ans animals, to relieve sickness and illness to all patients. To help patients to contiue with their lives in good health by providing quality of life in a pain free enviroment. Doing this by both personal appointments, and by distant healing where ever the patient may live. Holding surgeries in different parts of the country on tour with our charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MALCOLM ROOKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £4.58k | £855 | £913 | £623 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.44k | £4.40k | £1.12k | £707 | £566 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ANIMALS SPIRITUAL HEALING FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FOR THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 St. Andrews Close
Ponsanooth
TRURO
TR3 7HZ
- Phone:
- 07581137649
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window