EDGWARE ADATH YISROEL CONGREGATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and administer the Edgware Adath Yisroel Congregation and its Synagogue and to advance orthodox Jewish religious education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£651,307
Donations and legacies | £462.95k | |
Charitable activities | £183.74k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £4.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£684,311
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £684.31k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £684.31k |
People

19 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 02 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN RICHMAN | Chair | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dickson | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dov Jonathan Levy | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Breuer-Weil | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ron Anthony Sternberg | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Joseph Milstein | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Nathan Gubbay | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Jaeger | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shimon Fhima | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Howard Busse | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Marc Ucko | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Garfield | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Anthony Robert Paris | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Nathan Davis | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Howard Sumroy | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £573.45k | £508.04k | £471.23k | £549.56k | £651.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £523.85k | £493.35k | £513.92k | £515.65k | £684.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £79.78k | £56.99k | £40.40k | £41.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £346.64k | £351.06k | N/A | £379.56k | £462.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £226.01k | £138.57k | N/A | £169.51k | £183.74k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £800 | £845 | N/A | £50 | £4.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £17.56k | N/A | £448 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £523.85k | £493.35k | N/A | £515.65k | £684.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £1.56k | N/A | £1.32k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.77m | £0 | N/A | £0 | £2.76m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £2.77m | N/A | £2.76m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £402.64k | £375.16k | N/A | £313.25k | £258.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £420.90k | £379.43k | N/A | £323.25k | £300.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
(I) TO TAKE OVER AND CONTINUE TO. ORGANISE MANAGE AND ADMINISTER THE CONGREGATION AND SYNAGOGUE KNOWN AS THE EDGWARE ADATH YISROEL CONGREGATION WHICH WAS ESTABLISHED AND REGULATED BY A CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 24TH NOVEMBER 1967 AND WHICH IS RECOGNISED AS HAVING CHARITABLE STATUS BY THE INLAND REVENUE (II) TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF EDGWARE, MIDDLESEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAINTAINING A SYNAGOGUE AND PROVIDING SERVICES FOR PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH RESIDING IN SUCH AREAS (III) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (IV) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EDGEWARE, MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
265 Hale Lane
Edgware
HA8 8NW
- Phone:
- 02082382491
- Email:
- admin@eayc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window