TWENTY FIRST CENTURY LEGACY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as responsible individuals, citizens and members of their communities. This is achieved through the Be the Best you can Be! Programme, currently available for UK Primary and Secondary Schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 May 2008: Standard registration
- 11 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 June 2021: Funds transferred to 1082777 SHINE: SUPPORT AND HELP IN EDUCATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 30/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.05k | £80.73k | £19.94k | £5.82k | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.90k | £133.81k | £28.94k | £11.64k | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 16 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 31 October 2018 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 31 October 2018 | 123 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, CITIZENS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window