BRIDGES HULL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to help disengaged / disaffected young people in the Bransholme area of Hull. It does this by developing positive relationships with them and engaging them in a broad range of social and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £87,099 from 2 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 02 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Croxon | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
ANDREW MICHAEL DORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.33k | £88.92k | £94.49k | £83.81k | £94.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.84k | £89.28k | £92.36k | £81.00k | £100.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £85.10k | £83.09k | £86.39k | £80.64k | £87.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) 09TH JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: A)TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25, AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS, LIVING IN BRANSHOLME AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: 1) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; II) ADVANCING EDUCATION III)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; IV)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS B)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN BRANSHOLME, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE'S STATEMENT OF BELIEF (CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE). APPENDIX A C) TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL ILL HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING IN BRANSHOLME, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT, LOSS, HARDSHIP, NEGLECT, ABUSE, OR IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL OR DRUGS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. D)TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BRANSHOLME, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. E) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE IN MATTERS OF SEX AND CONTRACEPTION AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF PARENTS, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN LIVING IN BRANSHOLME, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, AND TO DEVELOP AMONGST THEM A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY IN REGARD TO SEXUAL BEHAVIOUR WITH THE AIM OF PREVENTING AND MITIGATING THE SUFFERING AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP CAUSED BY UNWANTED PREGNANCY. F)THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN BRANSHOLME, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: I)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP II)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION , TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, IN SUCH SUBJECTS AS WILL BROADEN HORIZONS, DEVELOP SKILLS AND IMPROVE EMPLOYABILITY AND BY THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE. III)THE CREATION FOR TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS: IV) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED V)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. VI)SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
BRANSHOLME, OTHER PARTS OF HULL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pennine
Pennine Way
Bransholme
HULL
HU7 5EF
- Phone:
- 01482 820454
- Email:
- admin@bridgeshull.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window