REACHOUT BULGARIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving the care of children in orphanages by providing clothing, equipment and care. The charity regularly takes specialist therapist teams to work with special needs children and to teach staff basic care and management of these children. Furthermore, the charity co-ordinates work parties to enhance and improve the living conditions in orphanages, for example installing bathrooms and toilets
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bulgaria
Governance
- 17 June 2008: Standard registration
- 16 November 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £12.70k | £5.10k | £39.27k | £16.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.72k | £12.23k | £5.87k | £38.10k | £20.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 1 MARY 2008
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SUPPLIES FOR HOSPITALS IN BULGARIA. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS IN BULGARIA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHES, SCHOOL AND SPORTS EQUIPMENT AND ASSISTING IN THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF ORPHANAGES.
Area of benefit
BULGARIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window