THE BERLIOZ SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES INCLUDE AT LEAST TWO MEETINGS A YEAR IN LONDON, VISITS TO PLACES AND EVENTS ASSOCIATED WITH BERLIOZ AND REDUCED-PRICE TICKET OFFERS. THE MAIN EVENT OF EACH YEAR IS A THEMED STUDY WEEKEND, USUALLY IN NOVEMBER. WE PUBLISH A REGULAR BULLETIN (AT LEAST THREE ISSUES PER YEAR), COMPLEMENTED BY A WEBSITE (WWW.THEBERLIOZSOCIETY.ORG.UK).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- France
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DIANA FRANCES BICKLEY | Chair | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Askew Taylor | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David Robert Glynn | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Gareth David Russell Jones | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr William Henry Edmondson | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Payne | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr LINDA EDMONDSON | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SIR ADAM NICHOLAS RIDLEY | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|||||||
LORD ALASTAIR JOHN LYNDHURST ABERDARE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
HELEN MARY PETCHEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SIMON JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARTIN RICHARD JOHN PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.90k | £10.26k | £14.04k | £12.65k | £14.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.02k | £11.39k | £12.93k | £16.10k | £15.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 2008 as amended on 01 Aug 2020 as amended on 09 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) ARE; 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY PROMOTING THE KNOWLEDGE OF, APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE OF, AND PERFORMANCES OF THE WORKS OF HECTOR BERLIOZ ( 1803-1869 ). 2) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BEVERLEY ROAD
LONDON
SW13 0LX
- Phone:
- 02088768398
- Email:
- sqing@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window