Financial history CAREFREE - FOSTERING INDEPENDENCE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1124492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.02m £877.58k £1.15m £1.38m £1.49m
Total expenditure £786.13k £1.01m £1.04m £1.35m £1.42m
Income from government contracts £383.72k £402.96k £627.91k £775.39k £820.90k
Income from government grants N/A £520 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.89k £70.30k £20.30k £12.52k £11.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £982.21k £807.27k £1.13m £1.36m £1.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49 £7 £588 £4.22k £8.43k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.13k £1.01m £1.04m £1.35m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.80k £0 £0 £10.85k £10.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0