Financial history BRIGHT SPARKS CHILDCARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1125428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £174.98k £135.77k £177.25k £147.41k £178.36k
Total expenditure £162.94k £142.49k £149.06k £172.18k £160.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £106.57k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A