BRIGHT SPARKS CHILDCARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
childcare/education for 2-5 year olds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £106,571 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 08 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Baumbach | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA JUNIPER | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE ROSE | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE CARPENTER | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH EMPTAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.98k | £135.77k | £177.25k | £147.41k | £178.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.94k | £142.49k | £149.06k | £172.18k | £160.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £106.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY OFFERING PLAY AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES IN A SAFE AND STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND DURING THE SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O WARDEN HOUSE PRIMARY SCHOOL
BIRDWOOD AVENUE
DEAL
CT14 9SF
- Phone:
- 01304389852
- Email:
- committeebsccc@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window