PEARTREE ALLSTARS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting activity with children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 25 June 2008: Standard registration
- PEAR TREE ALLSTARS FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN MARGARET CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DALLAS MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA ANN BAGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTORIA PEAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £5.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR THE GAME OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEAR TREE INFANT SCHOOL
PEAR TREE STREET
DERBY
DE23 8PN
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window