BRACKENHALL COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a centre with a range of services for 16 user groups. These range from young people's drama and dance groups, older peoples keep fit classes and groups for disabled people. The move to the newly built centre was made in May 2012. The Trust have worked with Open Art in bringing various art forms to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,985 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 30 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Homewood | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA FELLOWS | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Davis Adams | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glendene Gill | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALMA BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LEES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.56k | £117.33k | £59.34k | £64.98k | £93.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.20k | £1.79m | £105.12k | £117.21k | £147.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.45k | £12.00k | N/A | £19.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRACKENHALL/SHEEPRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BOUNDARIES SHOWN IN THE ATTACHED MAP (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2 TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. 3 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
BRACKENHALL/SHEEPRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northfield Hall
40 Norfolk Avenue
HUDDERSFIELD
HD2 1GS
- Phone:
- 01484721239
- Email:
- pamelafellows@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
brackenhallcommunitytrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window