Financial history THE HOLY FAMILY SISTERS OF THE NEEDY CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1126304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £64.49k £95.17k £117.27k £118.09k £149.47k
Total expenditure £71.73k £90.48k £107.75k £104.43k £122.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A