THE HOLY FAMILY SISTERS OF THE NEEDY CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Apart from the detailed aspects of the general work of the Charity as enlisted below, there is more concentration on vulnerable women or women in difficult situation. Presently, the Charity has extended its work to Scotland precisely in Aberdeen where the main concentration is on feeding the homeless on the street, helping the needy and free counselling to people battling with different issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
- Oldham
- Benin
- Burkina Faso
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- France
- Italy
- Nigeria
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 15 October 2008: Standard registration
- HOLY FAMILY SISTERS OF THE NEEDY (Previous name)
- HOLY FAMILY SISTERS OF THE NEEDY CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHINEDUM NWADIKE | Chair | 15 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Chidalu Mbajiorgu HFSN | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CONNELLY | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Connelly | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Joseph Justin OGBUOKIRI HFSN Trustee | Trustee | 15 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Joseph Justin Ogbuokiri HFSN | Trustee | 15 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Rev SR RUTH AMUKA MADUFORO HFSN | Trustee | 15 October 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.49k | £95.17k | £117.27k | £118.09k | £149.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.73k | £90.48k | £107.75k | £104.43k | £122.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 4 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PREGNANT WOMEN AND GIRLS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND ADVICE; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THE DESTITUTE; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION OF ROMAN CATHOLIC WOMEN KNOWN AS THE HOLY FAMILY SISTERS OF THE NEEDY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Routh Street
East Ham
London
E6 5XX
- Phone:
- 02036898870
- Email:
- holyfamilysrs@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
holyfamilysistersng.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window