NORTH WALES REPTILE AND RAPTOR SANCTUARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NWRR is a sanctuary for birds of prey and reptiles, both wild and captive bred. Animals coming into the sanctuary can be in very poor condition and in need of extensive veterinary help and our remit is to get these back to good health and then try to find suitable re-homes. We also educate: authorities, the publicand retailers to the complex, needs of these animals and the long term commitment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 2008: Standard registration
- 02 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.41k | £24.26k | £20.20k | £19.32k | £13.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.63k | £24.63k | £20.65k | £19.41k | £13.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 11 January 2019 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 31 August 2017 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 28 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window