NAPTON MUSIC FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising music events to support local charities and young musicians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD GLYN DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LINDA SCOTT OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON CLARKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £74 | £46.31k | £53.55k | £56.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.43k | £1.48k | £36.64k | £49.79k | £54.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: ("THE OBJECTS") TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND OBJECTS IN NAPTON ON THE HILL, SOUTHAM, WARWICKSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Napton Narrowboats
Napton Marina
Tomlow Road
Stockton
SOUTHAM
Warwicks
- Phone:
- 01926817275
- Email:
- info@naptonfestival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window