MEDINA MARCHING BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth marching band, providing the tuition in the learning of music from the age of 8yrs upwards. We perform at many carnivals, shows and prestigious events on the isle of wight and mainland.We also perform concerts wher our music can be marches, themed and concert pieces. We have approx. 60 members in the band and have seen a steady increase in numbers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 17 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Philip Downer | Chair | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jason Penney | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Owers | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JEANETTE BLACKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MOREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.07k | £5.73k | £19.85k | £19.36k | £36.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £6.95k | £16.55k | £22.82k | £37.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
IN ORDER TO MEET ITS OBJECTIVES THE BAND SHALL PROVIDE: A. MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, WHENEVER POSSIBLE. B. TUITION IN PLAYING INSTRUMENTS. C. TUITION IN THEORY OF MUSIC. D. TUITION IN MARCHING DRILL. E. BAND UNIFORM. F. ALL MUSIC, MARCH CARDS AND MUSIC STANDS. G. TRANSPORT TO AND FROM BAND ENGAGEMENTS. H. INSURANCE FOR MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, WHETHER OWNED BY THE BAND OR INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS, WHILST THEY ARE BEING USED FOR BAND PRACTICES AND PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 Manor Crescent
NEWPORT
Isle Of Wight
PO30 2BH
- Phone:
- 07837792518
- Email:
- medinamarchingband@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window