ST MARY'S PRITTLEWELL BELLS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Religion by providing funding to restore and recast or replace the peal of bells in the church of St Mary the Virgin, East Street, Prittlewell, Essex, SS2 6LQ and any necessary ancillary work required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 18 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Chin-a-Loy | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Halliwell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE FRANCES PORTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SLOMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SLOMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £470 | £0 | £549 | £0 | £726 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £69 | £1.73k | £3.17k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO RESTORE AND RECAST OR REPLACE THE PEAL OF BELLS IN THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN EAST STREET PRITTLEWELL ESSEX SS2 6LQ AND TO CARRY OUT ALL THE NECESSARY ANCILLARY WORK TO MAKE THIS POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE ST MARY THE VIRGIN EAST STREET PRITTLEWELL ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY'S CHURCH
EAST STREET
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 6LQ
- Phone:
- 01702545889
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window