Financial history OUR PLACE

Charity Number: 1124280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.15k £41.20k £25.88k £31.33k £72.18k
Total expenditure £46.27k £39.15k £28.82k £30.30k £42.20k
Income from government contracts £28.00k £29.00k £11.25k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k