CHOICES ISLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advisory and support services for women facing unplanned pregnancy and support for post abortion or other pregnancy or child loss concerns. Befriending service offering practical support, group participation and individual mentoring for vulnerable pregnant women or new mothers. Relationships and Sexual Health Education project for local young people and targeted groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £61,255 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 27 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Dulley | Chair | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celia Wyatt | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Selby | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwadamilola Makinde | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Matthew Davis | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr HANNAH RACHEL CARTER | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.80k | £188.62k | £214.36k | £219.67k | £390.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.66k | £163.70k | £183.16k | £226.96k | £305.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £20.00k | £61.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL; 3.2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH. 3.3 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE; 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Choices Islington
390 Caledonian Road
LONDON
N1 1DN
- Phone:
- 020 7700 4475
- Email:
- info@choicescharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window