WOMEN IN NEED (JINJA) - WIN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WIN funds a variety of projects to support and empower some of the desparately poor women in and around Jinja, Uganda. These include micro-finance for small business start up, adult literacy and numeracy, counselling and training in job skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 June 2008: Standard registration
- 26 April 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.45k | £32.90k | £10.16k | £1.39k | £960 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.08k | £33.07k | £8.53k | £4.90k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"). TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN JINJA, UGANDA BY = ENCOURAGING THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY POVERTY, WAR, TRIBALISM OR EDUCATIONAL DISADVANTAGE, TO BECOME SELF SUPPORTING = RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS = PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH = ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROMOTING BASIC LITERACY SKILLS = PROVIDING SAFE ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY WAR, POVERTY, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR TRIBALISM
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window