Trustees INTERNATIONAL BACCALAUREATE ORGANIZATION (UK) LIMITED
Charity number: 1126291

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Ruth ELLWOOD ARIS | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olli-Pekka Heinonen | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Henry Oldreive | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Ralph Homer | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.