Accounts and annual returns HIGHFIELD RANGERS

Charity number: 1133617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 June 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 05 June 2024 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 02 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 03 March 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 March 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window