Financial history HIGHFIELD RANGERS

Charity number: 1133617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.55k £40.40k £86.95k £98.88k £157.45k
Total expenditure £63.59k £27.60k £84.08k £89.03k £142.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £5.20k £22.73k £25.47k £34.09k