HIGHFIELD RANGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services for young people in Leicester and Leicestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,087 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
Governance
- 20 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhondell Stabana | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqeline Sheila Webb | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
INGEMAR WALKER Secretary | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Paul | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tony Mason | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Moses Webb Treasurer | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE CHRISTIAN | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD MORRIS | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.55k | £40.40k | £86.95k | £98.88k | £157.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.59k | £27.60k | £84.08k | £89.03k | £142.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £5.20k | £22.73k | £25.47k | £34.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2021
(These accounts |
03 March 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2020
(These accounts |
22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (II) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (B) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. (C) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHFIELD RANGERS F C
443 GLENEAGLES AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE4 7YJ
- Phone:
- 01162660009
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window