THE ACADEMY FOR THEATRE ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the edication and training of the public in areas of social and economic deprivation( which are in the Midlands) in the performing arts, in particular in music and theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Alcock | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Adams | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES ALCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.42k | £189.52k | £242.20k | £136.72k | £176.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.27k | £171.27k | £200.44k | £203.59k | £200.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.78k | £55.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (WHICH ARE IN THE MIDLANDS) IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR IN MUSIC AND THEATRE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: A TO STIMULATE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL AND THEATRICAL EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE; AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; B TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION DRAMA AND OTHER ARTS, ESPECIALLY THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH SEEK TO MAKE THE ARTS RELEVANT TO THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DRAMATIC IMPROVISATION, LITERATURE, DANCE, SINGING, AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Academy For Theatre Arts
Bradwell Community Education Centre
Riceyman Road
NEWCASTLE
Staffordshire
ST5 8LF
- Phone:
- 01782660818
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window