Financial history GATEWAY CHURCH SWINDON

Charity number: 1123831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £612.42k £584.51k £570.61k £481.96k £536.76k
Total expenditure £613.30k £483.32k £626.89k £577.34k £487.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £436 £73.24k £12.60k £100 £33.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £498.29k £544.63k £470.35k N/A £508.17k
Income - Other trading activities £100.47k £30.02k £95.45k N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.64k £1.10k £2.17k N/A £23.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £93 £43 £28 N/A £1.09k
Income - Other £4.93k £8.72k £2.62k N/A £4.20k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £613.30k £483.32k £626.89k N/A £487.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £2.52k £3.00k N/A £2.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £28.09k £21.00k £71.78k N/A £50.51k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0