TREWAN SANDS CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To relieve the sickness of disabled and terminally ill children in the UK (who may be accompanied by their parents, guardians or carers) and who would not otherwise have a holiday. b) To provide holidays for other members of the community who would not otherwise have a holiday and to supply sports equipment, adapted and disability aids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhea Charnock | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE DAWSON | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charnock | Trustee | 03 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BOWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.46k | £198.00k | £235.10k | £195.86k | £204.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.75k | £227.80k | £232.80k | £195.81k | £188.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- A)TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF DISABLED AND TERMINALLY ILL CHILDREN IN THE UK (WHO MAY BE ACCOMPANIED BY THEIR PARENTS, GUARDIANS OR CARERS) AND WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE A HOLIDAY, AND WHOSE CIRCUMSTANCES SHOW THAT THEY ARE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND, TO SUPPLY SPORTS EQUIPMENT, ADAPTED AND DISABILITY AIDS. B)TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE A HOLIDAY AND WHOSE CIRCUMSTANCES SHOW THAT THEY ARE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY AND SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND, TO SUPPLY SPORTS EQUIPMENT, ADAPTED AND DISABILITY AIDS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENNINE HOUSE
PENNINE BUSINESS PARK
PILSWORTH ROAD
HEYWOOD
OL10 2TL
- Phone:
- 01706369503
- Email:
- info@tsctrust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window