Financial history HOPEFUL FUTURES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123984
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/03/2011 19/03/2012 19/03/2013 19/03/2014 19/03/2015
Total gross income £2.55k £3.53k £3.81k £3.86k £3.50k
Total expenditure £6.36k £5.25k £6.36k £4.86k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A