FIELDS CHILDREN'S CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pre-school children and to promote community capacity building among parents and carers, living within the designated reach of the Fields Children's Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 May 2008: Standard registration
- 25 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £4.00k | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £591 | £1.06k | £4.20k | £4.80k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 05 March 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 18 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN LIVING WITHIN THE DESIGNATED REACH OF THE FIELDS CHILDREN'S CENTRE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF NURSERY AND DAY-CARE, FOR FAMILIES WHO EXPERIENCE SOCIAL, MEDICAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. 2 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING AMONG PARENTS AND CARERS OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN LIVING WITHIN THE DESIGNATED REACH OF THE FIELDS CHILDREN'S CENTRE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY PROGRAMME TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS AND POTENTIAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window